House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Matsumoto, Muraoka, Pierick, Reyes Oda voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-25 2:00PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 825).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Poepoe, Shimizu.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 481).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 431).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Muraoka, Pierick, Reyes Oda, Shimizu voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto, Reyes Oda, Shimizu voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Hussey, Lowen, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1720) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Perruso, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Shimizu; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Hashem, Kahaloa, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-12-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte, Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Chang). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-25 9:15AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Re-Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|