Senate | 02/04/2025 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 01-27-25 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-24-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Pending Introduction. |