Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB214 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 214 THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO INCOME. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 214
44 THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 214
1212
1313 THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO INCOME.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the tip credit authorized by section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, allows employers to pay certain employees at a rate below the state minimum wage by calculating tips as a portion of the employee's wages. The purpose of this Act is to increase the income of tipped workers by gradually phasing out the tip credit so that all employers shall be required to pay all employees at least the minimum wage. SECTION 2. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows: "(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid no less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (4) $1.00 per hour beginning October 1, 2022; (5) $1.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2024; [and (6) $1.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2028,] (6) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2025; (7) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2027; (8) 25 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2029; and (9) 0 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2031, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least [50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least] $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage." SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the tip credit authorized by section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, allows employers to pay certain employees at a rate below the state minimum wage by calculating tips as a portion of the employee's wages.
5050
5151 The purpose of this Act is to increase the income of tipped workers by gradually phasing out the tip credit so that all employers shall be required to pay all employees at least the minimum wage.
5252
5353 SECTION 2. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows:
5454
5555 "(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid no less than:
5656
5757 (1) 25 cents;
5858
5959 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015;
6060
6161 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016;
6262
6363 (4) $1.00 per hour beginning October 1, 2022;
6464
6565 (5) $1.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2024; [and
6666
6767 (6) $1.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2028,]
6868
6969 (6) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2025;
7070
7171 (7) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2027;
7272
7373 (8) 25 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2029; and
7474
7575 (9) 0 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2031,
7676
7777 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least [50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least] $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage."
7878
7979 SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
8080
8181 SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect upon its approval.
8282
8383
8484
8585 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
8686
8787 INTRODUCED BY:
8888
8989 _____________________________
9090
9191
9292
9393
9494
9595 Report Title: Minimum Wage; Tip Credit Description: Implements a phased elimination of the tip credit. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
9696
9797
9898
9999
100100
101101 Report Title:
102102
103103 Minimum Wage; Tip Credit
104104
105105
106106
107107 Description:
108108
109109 Implements a phased elimination of the tip credit.
110110
111111
112112
113113
114114
115115
116116
117117 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.