House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 190) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 190).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Lamosao, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Lee, C., DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, McKelvey.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-25-25 5:30PM in conference room 411.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-25 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senators Lee, C. added as Co-Chair. Senator Hashimoto discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-25 9:45AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-25 10:15AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Hashem, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Shimizu.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Elefante, Gabbard, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; McKelvey, DeCorte.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 459).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1915), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-25 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kapela, Kitagawa, Ward excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from PBS/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lamosao, Belatti, Ichiyama, Iwamoto, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
The committee on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Iwamoto, Hashem, Ichiyama, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/WAL on Wednesday, 03-19-25 10:30AM in House conference room 411 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to PBS/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 109) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-25 10:25AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Wakai, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-25 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|