House
|
04/16/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Elefante, Chang Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 774).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 573).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-04-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1784) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Cochran, Hashem, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kahaloa.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-25-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kapela, Kitagawa, Ward excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-25 9:05AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 112) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-25 10:01AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Wakai, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) DeCorte; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-25 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to HHS/PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|