House
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kapela, Kitagawa, Ward excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-18-25 2:15PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt, Iwamoto, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1256) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kapela, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-13-25 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to LAB, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 128) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-12-25 9:50AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-11-25 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Wakai, Fukunaga, Rhoads, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|