House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Grandinetti, Evslin, Kitagawa, La Chica, Miyake, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-11-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 131).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Chang, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-25 10:01AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) DeCorte; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|