Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 46).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Perruso, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Perruso, Shimizu.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 481).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 435).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Hussey, Lowen, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1722) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Todd, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-14-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-25 10:01AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-04-25 3:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 01-30-25 3:01PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|