House
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lamosao, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Iwamoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-13-25 9:00AM in House conference room 411 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-25 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|