Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB414 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2025

Amended

Bill March 20, 2025
Bill March 14, 2025
Bill February 28, 2025
Bill February 7, 2025