Senate | 02/12/2025 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Reported from EDU/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Ihara, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, C., Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | The committee(s) on EDU/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Referred to EDU/LBT, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Introduced. |