Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 122) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 122).
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Kitagawa, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-25 2:15PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-25 2:00PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-25 2:00PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Shimizu.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 779).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 646).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Marten excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1989) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-28-25 1:59PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-28-25.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-25 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1294), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-11-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-25 10:04AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-25 9:15AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|