House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to EEP, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 161) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Keohokalole. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) DeCorte, Lee, C.). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Re-Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to HHS/EIG, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|