House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Iwamoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Garrett, Muraoka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 113).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Sayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Olds; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 1:30PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 799).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Sayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy Co-Chairs; Olds, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Aquino, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 465).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Muraoka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1929), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-25 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kapela, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-18-25 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt, Iwamoto, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-12-25 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 43).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-28-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from HHS/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Lee, C., Ihara, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-25 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to HHS/LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|