Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Morikawa, Lamosao, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-25 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-25 9:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-24-25 9:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Lamosao, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; DeCorte.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 466).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1921), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-25 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kapela, Kitagawa, Ward excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lamosao, Belatti, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Iwamoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-20-25 9:30AM in House conference room 411 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|