Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB474 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-THE SENATE S.B. NO. 474 THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025 S.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO PSYCHOLOGISTS. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+THE SENATE S.B. NO. 474 THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to psychologists. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 474
4-THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025 S.D. 1
4+THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 474
1212
1313 THIRTY-THIRD LEGISLATURE, 2025
1414
15-S.D. 1
15+
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 relating to psychologists.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. Section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "(a) A psychologist employed in a civil service clinical psychologist position in this State after January 1, 1988, shall be licensed subject to: (1) Meeting the requirements of section 465-7; and (2) Obtaining licensure within two years from the date of employment[.]; provided that a psychologist employed by the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall obtain licensure within five years from the date of employment." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2077; provided that the amendments made to section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, by section 1 of this Act shall not be repealed when that section is amended on July 1, 2026, pursuant to section 27 of Act 93, Session Laws of Hawaii 2024; provided further that on July 1, 2030, this Act shall be repealed and section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on July 1, 2077.
47+ SECTION 1. Section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "(a) A psychologist employed in a civil service clinical psychologist position in this State after January 1, 1988, shall be licensed subject to: (1) Meeting the requirements of section 465-7; and (2) Obtaining licensure within two years from the date of employment[.]; provided that a psychologist employed by the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall obtain licensure within ten years from the date of employment." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval; provided that the amendments made to section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes by section 1 of this Act shall not be repealed when that section is amended on July 1, 2026, pursuant to section 27 of Act 93, Session Laws of Hawaii 2024; provided further that on July 1, 2035, this Act shall be repealed and section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on July 1, 2026. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows:
5050
5151 "(a) A psychologist employed in a civil service clinical psychologist position in this State after January 1, 1988, shall be licensed subject to:
5252
5353 (1) Meeting the requirements of section 465-7; and
5454
55- (2) Obtaining licensure within two years from the date of employment[.]; provided that a psychologist employed by the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall obtain licensure within five years from the date of employment."
55+ (2) Obtaining licensure within two years from the date of employment[.]; provided that a psychologist employed by the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall obtain licensure within ten years from the date of employment."
5656
5757 SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
5858
59- SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2077; provided that the amendments made to section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, by section 1 of this Act shall not be repealed when that section is amended on July 1, 2026, pursuant to section 27 of Act 93, Session Laws of Hawaii 2024; provided further that on July 1, 2030, this Act shall be repealed and section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on July 1, 2077.
59+ SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval; provided that the amendments made to section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes by section 1 of this Act shall not be repealed when that section is amended on July 1, 2026, pursuant to section 27 of Act 93, Session Laws of Hawaii 2024; provided further that on July 1, 2035, this Act shall be repealed and section 465-7.6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which it read on July 1, 2026.
6060
61- Report Title: DCR; Psychologists; Licensing Description: Requires clinical psychologists employed by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to obtain licensure within five years from the date of employment. Sunsets on 7/1/2030. Effective 7/1/2077. (SD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
61+
62+
63+INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
64+
65+INTRODUCED BY:
66+
67+_____________________________
68+
69+
70+
71+
72+
73+ Report Title: DCR; Psychologists; Licensing Description: Requires clinical psychologists employed by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to obtain licensure within 10 years from the date of employment. Sunsets on 7/1/2035. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
6274
6375
6476
6577
6678
6779 Report Title:
6880
6981 DCR; Psychologists; Licensing
7082
7183
7284
7385 Description:
7486
75-Requires clinical psychologists employed by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to obtain licensure within five years from the date of employment. Sunsets on 7/1/2030. Effective 7/1/2077. (SD1)
87+Requires clinical psychologists employed by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to obtain licensure within 10 years from the date of employment. Sunsets on 7/1/2035.
7688
7789
7890
7991
8092
8193
8294
8395 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.