Senate | 02/07/2025 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | Pending Introduction. |