Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Amended

Bill April 26, 2025
Bill April 4, 2025
Bill March 18, 2025
Bill February 24, 2025