Senate | 02/11/2025 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-11-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-06-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-25 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Referred to GVO/EIG, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Introduced. |