House
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1371) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lamosao, Belatti, Ichiyama, Iwamoto, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-13-25 9:00AM in House conference room 411 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-28-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 780) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-25 1:06PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|