House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Lee, C..
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-25 10:31AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-25 10:03AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from HOU/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to HOU/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|