Senate | 02/13/2025 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Re-Referred to EDT/CPN, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | The committee(s) on EDT/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-25 1:03PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Re-Referred to EDT/CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EDT. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EDT. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kim, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-06-25 1:20PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Referred to EDT. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Introduced. |