House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1355) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Miyake, Grandinetti, Kila, Kitagawa, La Chica, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-12-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 223) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-25 9:34AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|