House
|
04/11/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2052), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Perruso, Kahaloa, Kusch; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-10-25 9:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-02-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported from EIG/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EIG were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Referred to EIG/AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered.
|
|
|