House
|
04/25/2025
|
Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 877).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form. 17 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye, Kim . 5 No(es): Senator(s) DeCorte, Fukunaga, Ihara, McKelvey, San Buenaventura. 3 Excused: Senator(s) Awa, Chang, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Received notice of reconsideration and Senate agreement (Sen. Com. No. 870).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-24-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-24-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-21-25; agree to House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 778).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Adopted as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Alcos, Hussey, Reyes Oda, Tarnas voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Grandinetti, Iwamoto, Kapela, Muraoka, Poepoe, Souza voting no (6) and Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Cochran, Garrett, Ichiyama, Perruso, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2139) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Chun, Ilagan, Lowen, Marten, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Iwamoto; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-16-25 2:00PM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2080) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Kahaloa, Kusch; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-10-25 9:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 513) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-03-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported from EIG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EIG were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-25 3:01PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred to EIG.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered.
|
|
|