House | 04/04/2025 | Referred to JHA/LMG, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) DeCorte). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | One Day Notice 04-03-25. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1591) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-25 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | The committee(s) on JDC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-25 10:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-25 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Offered. |