Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 752).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Todd excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2123), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Hashem, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-15-25 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-02-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Wakai, Fukunaga, Rhoads, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-25 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred to PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered.
|
|
|