House
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 535) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) DeCorte). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-03-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported from TCA/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1635) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA/CPN deferred the measure until 04-01-25 3:03PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-25 10:04AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred to TCA/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered.
|
|
|