House | 04/04/2025 | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 488) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | One Day Notice 04-03-25. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Re-Referred to HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-25 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to HHS, WAM . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Offered. |