House | 04/04/2025 | Referred to WAL, ECD, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 449). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | One Day Notice 04-02-25. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported from EIG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EIG were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | The committee(s) on EIG has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-25 4:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to EIG . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Offered. |