Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 736).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2106), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Kapela, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 04-11-25 9:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to LAB, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 453).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-02-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Lee, C., Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Referred to LBT.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered.
|
|
|