House | 04/04/2025 | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 456) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | One Day Notice 04-02-25. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to EDT. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Offered. |