Senate | 04/01/2025 | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte, Fevella). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | One Day Notice 04-01-25. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1420) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Chang, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-25 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Offered. |