House | 03/08/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 559. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 430. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 414. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/17/2023 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee: Boden, Gustoff and Staed. H.J. 95. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 59. |