House | 02/08/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 274. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 161. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 208. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2023 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Fry and Matson. H.J. 178. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 176. |