House | 03/07/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 539. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 135. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 190. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee: Holt, Bradley and Matson. H.J. 95. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 59. |