House | 03/22/2023 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 731. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 726. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 509. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 484. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 482. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Substituted for SF 143. S.J. 482. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 143. S.J. 245. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 245. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 241. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Passed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 237. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 183. |