LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF123
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF123
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF123
Action History
House
02/20/2023
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
House
02/15/2023
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365.
House
02/14/2023
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
House
02/09/2023
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 12:00PM RM 19.
House
02/07/2023
Subcommittee: Sorensen, Collins and Kurth. H.J. 260.
House
01/26/2023
Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 192.