LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF135
Draft Versions
IA
Iowa House Bill HF135
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF135
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note
February 16, 2023
Bill
January 26, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 5, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 7, 2023
Compare