Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 21. S.J. 243. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 243. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 225. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 219. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 195. |