LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF144
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF144
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF144
Action History
House
02/28/2023
Referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 442.
House
02/14/2023
Amendment H-1021 filed. H.J. 310.
House
02/07/2023
Amendment H-1010 filed. H.J. 263.
House
02/01/2023
Amendment H-1006 filed. H.J. 232.
House
01/26/2023
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 196.