House
|
05/12/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 373.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 356.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Explanation of vote. S.J. 344.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 280.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 288.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 29, nays 20. S.J. 288.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Substituted for SF 148. S.J. 287.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Attached to SF 148. S.J. 287.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 287.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 274.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Point of order raised pursuant to Art. III, Sect. 29, Const. of Iowa. B. Meyer object to title; ruled point not well taken. H.J. 274.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 274.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 54, nays 46. H.J. 273.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1014, yeas 53, nays 45, adopted, as amended. H.J. 272.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 271.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1014, as amended, yeas 58, nays 41. H.J. 271.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1014, as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 270.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1015 to amendment H-1014 adopted. H.J. 270.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 270.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1007, as amended, yeas 38, nays 61. H.J. 269.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1007, as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 269.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1013 to amendment H-1007 adopted. H.J. 269.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1002, as amended, yeas 24, nays 75, lost. H.J. 268.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1017 to amendment H-1002 filed, adopted. H.J. 268.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1004 to amendment H-1002 withdrawn. H.J. 267.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment H-1003 to amendment H-1002 withdrawn. H.J. 267.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Amendments H-1013, H-1014 and H-1015 filed. H.J. 263.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Amendment H-1007 filed. H.J. 244.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Amendment H-1004 filed. H.J. 232.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Amendment H-1003 filed. H.J. 213.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Amendment H-1002 filed. H.J. 209.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 205.
|
|
|