Senate | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee: Reichman, Rowley, and Weiner. S.J. 324. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 310. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 310. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 293. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 293. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1. H.J. 289. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 216. |