House | 02/28/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 450. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2617. | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 317. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 8:00AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee: Osmundson, Buck and Johnson. H.J. 122. | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 74. |