LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF2103
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF2103
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF2103
Action History
House
02/07/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2363.
House
02/06/2024
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 208.
House
01/30/2024
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
House
01/24/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 8:00AM RM 19.
House
01/24/2024
Subcommittee: Wills, J., Holt and Srinivas. H.J. 132.
House
01/23/2024
Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 118.