House | 03/07/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 554. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2608. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 282. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee: Holt, Olson and Wheeler. H.J. 132. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 120. |