LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF2114
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF2114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF2114
Action History
House
02/15/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2546.
House
02/13/2024
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 259.
House
02/06/2024
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
House
01/31/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:30PM House Lounge 2.
House
01/31/2024
Subcommittee: Wills, J., Thomson, C. and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 170.
House
01/23/2024
Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 120.