Senate | 03/21/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 459. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 495. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/29/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Subcommittee: Rowley, Knox, and J. Taylor. S.J. 355. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 349. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 349. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 335. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 330. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Amendment H-8025 adopted. H.J. 330. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Amendment H-8025 filed. H.J. 318. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 129. |