House | 02/29/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 481. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 586. | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 473. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2023 1:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Kressig and Thomson, C. H.J. 275. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 251. |