House | 02/19/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 316. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2306. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 176. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 10:30AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee: Andrews, Gustafson and Levin. H.J. 143. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 138. |